Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giorgio Lingua

Apostolic Nuncio to Cuba

Titular Archbishop of Tuscania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1960 BornFossano, Italy
10 Nov 198424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fossano, Italy
4 Sep 201050.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tuscania
4 Sep 201050.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jordan
4 Sep 201050.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iraq
9 Oct 201050.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tuscania
17 Mar 201554.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cuba

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Lingua:
Archbishop Giorgio Lingua (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Cuba

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Cuba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,855
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Mar 2015