Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Virgilio Fiorenzi (Fiorentini)

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
27 Jun 160545.4AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
3 Jul 160545.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
9 Dec 164484.9DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Virgilio Fiorenzi (Fiorentini)
Bishop Virgilio Fiorenzi (Fiorentini) (born 1560, died ) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Diocese of Perugia
Ordained BishopSan Silvestro al Quirinale, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: AT, 12 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017