Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Napoleone Comitoli

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548¹Born
19 Jul 159143.5AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
11 Aug 159143.6Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
30 Aug 162476.6DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Napoleone Comitoli (VIAF: 88744302)
Bishop Napoleone Comitoli (born 1548, died ) Bishop of Perugia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelleone
Ordained BishopS. Marcel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 277
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 272
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 30, Number 147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018