Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Aresti

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera


Events

DateEventTitle
11 May 1601AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
20 May 1601Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
1 May 1609DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabio Aresti:
Bishop Fabio Aresti (died ) Bishop of Lucera

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 225
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 37, Number 190
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1601, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015