Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Gozzadini

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹BornNaxos
27 Jan 161643.0AppointedArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
14 Feb 161643.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Naxos, Greece
25 Oct 162148.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
29 Mar 165380.2DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Gozzadini:
Archbishop Angelo Gozzadini (born 1573, died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 253, and Page 151
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 60, Number 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015