Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giovanni Battista Colonna

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Apr 1636AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
27 Apr 1636Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
8 Apr 1637DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Colonna:
Patriarch Giovanni Battista Colonna (died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 203
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 97, Number 582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013