Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Landi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fossombrone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹BornVelletri
5 Jun 162850.4AppointedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
13 Jun 162850.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
15 Nov 163254.8ResignedBishop of Fossombrone, Italy
1638¹60.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Fossombrone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Landi
Bishop Benedetto Landi (born 1578, died 1638) Bishop Emeritus of Fossombrone

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 190
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 30
  • ob/c2+: AT, 12 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Jul 2016