Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tiberio Cardinal Cenci

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580²BornRome
24 Nov 162141.8AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
6 Mar 164565.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Apr 164565.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
26 Feb 165373.1DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tiberio Cenci:
Tiberio Cardinal Cenci (died ) Bishop of Jesi

  • a cardinal for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1645
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 71
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 25 Mar 2015