Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Malloni (Mallono), C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1579¹BornVicenza
5 Jun 162849.4AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
13 Jun 162849.4Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
26 Jun 163455.4AppointedBishop of Belluno, Italy
7 Feb 164970.0DiedBishop of Belluno, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Malloni (Mallono)
Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Malloni (Mallono) C.R.S. (born 1579, died ) Bishop of Belluno

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 314, and Page 112
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 Dec 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: AT, 12 Jul 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,984

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Sep 2016