Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Azzolini

Deceased

Bishop of Narni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583²BornFermo
17 Feb 162037.1AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
25 Feb 162037.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
2 Aug 163249.6AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
Nov 163350.8DiedBishop of Narni, Italy
28 Nov 163350.9Elevated to CardinalDied Before Publication

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Azzolini:
Bishop Lorenzo Azzolini Bishop of Narni

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Nov 1633
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 296, and Page 252
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 67, Number 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013