Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Mattei

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1601AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
8 Dec 1601Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
13 Jun 1622DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Mattei:
Bishop Orazio Mattei (died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 202
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 38, Number 194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013