Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cosimo de’ Bardi

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹BornFirenze
27 Jan 161640.0AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
7 Feb 161640.0Ordained BishopBishop of Carpentras, France
9 Sep 163054.6AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
18 Apr 163155.2DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cosimo de’ Bardi:
Archbishop Cosimo de’ Bardi (born 1576, died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 188, and Page 136
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 59, Number 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015