Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Esteban (Giovanni Stefano) Ferrero, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1568Born
29 Mar 159930.4AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
1 May 159930.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vercelli, Italy
20 Jan 160435.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
3 May 160738.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
21 Sep 161041.8DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan Esteban (Giovanni Stefano) Ferrero (VIAF: 8179009)
Bishop Juan Esteban (Giovanni Stefano) Ferrero O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiella
Ordained BishopSte Marie des Anges, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 364
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 330
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 35, Number 178
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 112, Number 711
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018