Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop (Thomas) Alfonso Pozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582Born
30 Mar 162038.2AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
5 Apr 162038.2Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
15 Jun 162038.4InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
25 Aug 162644.6DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for (Thomas) Alfonso Pozzi
Bishop (Thomas) Alfonso Pozzi (born 1582, died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 124
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 68, Number 399
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 67, Number 393
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018