Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Magalotti

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584²Born
7 Oct 162440.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 162440.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
16 Dec 162440.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Aquiro
28 Feb 162844.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
5 May 162844.3AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
7 May 162844.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ferrara, Italy
19 Sep 163753.7DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Magalotti (VIAF: 54138205)
Lorenzo Cardinal Magalotti (born 1584, died ) Bishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopQuirinal Palace, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Ferrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
  • a cardinal for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1624
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 26
  • ob/c2: AT, 21 Jun 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,875
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017