Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stefano Cardinal Durazzo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Genova, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1594Born
1618²23.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 163339.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 163439.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
5 Mar 163540.5AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
22 Apr 163540.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Genova, Italy
Oct 1664³70.1ResignedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
11 Oct 166672.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
11 Jul 166772.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Durazzo (VIAF: 89102485)
Stefano Cardinal Durazzo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Genova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMultedo, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ferrara, Diocese of Ferrara
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria in Monterone, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
  • a cardinal for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Nov 1633
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 24, and Page 207
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1635, Number 29
  • bd/ob/c2+: AT, 18 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Jan 2017