Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottavio Corsini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Tarsus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1588BornFirenze, Italy
17 Mar 162132.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
21 Mar 162132.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
4 Apr 162132.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
30 Dec 162335.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
30 Jul 164152.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Corsini (VIAF: 69044296)
Archbishop Ottavio Corsini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Tarsus

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 328
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 70, Number 409
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 3
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Oct 2016