Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innocenzo Massimi

Deceased

Bishop of Catania


Events

DateEventTitle
20 May 1613AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
15 Nov 1615Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
12 Mar 1621AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
24 Jun 1622AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
27 Jan 1624ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
1 Jul 1624AppointedBishop of Catania, Italy
21 Aug 1633DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Massimi
Bishop Innocenzo Massimi (died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,895
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 120, and Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 26
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Oct 2016