Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Paleotti

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1531¹Born
157140.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 159160.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bologna, Italy
13 Feb 159160.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
24 Mar 159160.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
23 Jul 159766.5SucceededArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
18 Oct 161079.7DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Paleotti (VIAF: 24945753)
Archbishop Alfonso Paleotti (born 1531, died ) Archbishop of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ferrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,295
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast