Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Fontana

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537¹Born
11 Sep 158952.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ferrara, Italy
11 Sep 158952.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
11 Sep 158952.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
7 Aug 159053.5SucceededBishop of Ferrara, Italy
5 Jul 161174.5DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Fontana
Bishop Giovanni Fontana (born 1537, died ) Bishop of Ferrara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVignola
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,201
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 196, and Page 258
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1589, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018