Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Giraldi

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1592AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
24 Jun 1592Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
29 Jan 1617DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Giraldi
Bishop Orazio Giraldi (died ) Bishop of Comacchio

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFerrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,297
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 173
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,592, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast