Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Silingardi

Deceased

Bishop of Modena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537¹BornModena
18 Jun 158245.4AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
9 Sep 158245.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
159154.0ResignedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
19 Feb 159356.1AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
9 Feb 159962.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
25 May 160164.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
13 Jul 160770.5DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Silingardi (VIAF: 7603840)
Bishop Gaspare Silingardi (born 1537, died ) Bishop of Modena

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,888
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 285
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,630
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016