Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cristoforo Boncompagni

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Oct 1578AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
25 Oct 1578Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Oct 1578Ordained PriestPriest
3 Oct 1603DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Boncompagni (VIAF: 90313461)
Archbishop Cristoforo Boncompagni (died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

EventPlace
Ordained DeaconAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana
Ordained PriestAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 24.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 39*
  • od/op/c01: AT, 24 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Aug 2021

Quantcast