Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giacomo (Jean Jacques) Barba, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Terni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1499¹Born
26 May 154647.4AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
6 Jun 154647.4Ordained BishopBishop of Teramo, Italy
3 Jul 155354.5AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
1 Oct 156566.7DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo (Jean Jacques) Barba
Bishop Giovanni Giacomo (Jean Jacques) Barba O.S.A. (born 1499, died ) Bishop of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceOtricoli

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213, and Page 112
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1546, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018