Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonmaria Cardinal Salviati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1537Born
8 Aug 156124.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
1564²26.9ResignedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
11 Jun 157235.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
8 Mar 157841.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
12 Dec 158346.8Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 158446.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
20 Apr 158750.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
24 Apr 160063.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
30 Aug 160063.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
16 Apr 160265.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonmaria Salviati (VIAF: 60171422)
Antonmaria Cardinal Salviati (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Papoul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Next to main altar, S. Giacomo in Augusta, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 18.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 270
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 284
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018