Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Galletti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alessano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1555AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
1560²ResignedBishop of Alessano, Italy
24 Jul 1564DiedBishop Emeritus of Alessano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Galletti
Bishop Giulio Galletti (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alessano

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 103
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 17 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018