Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio (Egidio) Soperchio, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1560AppointedBishop of Acci (Accia), France
30 Jan 1563AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
16 Oct 1585DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio (Egidio) Soperchio
Bishop Giulio (Egidio) Soperchio O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Caorle

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantua

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 151, and Page 92
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1560, Number 13*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018