Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Bernardi della Mirandola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1502¹Born
12 Feb 155250.1AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
18 Feb 155250.1Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
1554¹52.0ResignedBishop of Caserta, Italy
19 Jun 156563.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bernardi della Mirandola (VIAF: 2840319)
Bishop Antonio Bernardi della Mirandola (born 1502, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caserta

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSacristy, Apostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1552, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018