Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Bernardino Cardinal Scotti, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Piacenza, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478¹Born
20 Dec 155577.9AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
20 Dec 155577.9Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jan 155678.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
9 Aug 155981.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Piacenza, Italy
23 Jul 156890.5ResignedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
11 Dec 156890.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Piacenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Bernardino Scotti (VIAF: 8548116)
Giovanni Bernardino Cardinal Scotti C.R. (born 1478, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagliano di Sabina
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Paolo nella Via Ostiense, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 12.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1555
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 275, and Page 317
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1555, Number 28*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018