Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal Suau

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mirepoix, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503²Born
20 Dec 155552.9AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
20 Dec 155552.9Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jan 155653.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
26 Apr 156057.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
31 Jan 156158.0ResignedBishop of Mirepoix, France
29 Apr 156663.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Mirepoix, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jean Suau
Jean Cardinal Suau (born 1503, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mirepoix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle of Rieumes, Gascogne, Rieumes, Diocese of Lombez
Death PlaceAlexander VI chamber of the Apostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Spirito in Sassia, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 10.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017