Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Beltramini

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522²Born
21 Jun 156442.4AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
29 Jul 156543.5Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
Oct 1565³43.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
25 Mar 156644.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
1575²53.0DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Beltramini
Bishop Francesco Beltramini (born 1522, died 1575) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColle Val d'Elsa
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTerracina, Diocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Terracina, Diocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 310
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 253
  • ob/c2: AT, 4 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017