Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Beaton

Deceased

Archbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1524¹Born
4 Sep 155127.6AppointedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
17 Jul 155228.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Jul 155228.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Aug 155228.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
25 Apr 160379.3DiedArchbishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Beaton (VIAF: 71227856)
Archbishop James Beaton (born 1524, died ) Archbishop of Glasgow

EventPlace
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 50.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1552, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018