Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gilbert Génébrard, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537¹Born
10 May 159154.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
10 May 159255.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Aix, France
19 Sep 159356.7InstalledArchbishop of Aix, France
16 Feb 159760.1DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Génébrard (VIAF: 49234015)
Archbishop Gilbert Génébrard O.S.B. (born 1537, died ) Archbishop of Aix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiom, Puy de Dome
Ordained BishopSte Genevieve, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceSemur en Auxois, Cote d'Or

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1592, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018