Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Giovio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511¹Born
21 Aug 155140.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
11 Dec 155241.9SucceededBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
8 Dec 155342.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
Dec 156049.9ResignedBishop of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy
1563¹52.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Nocera de’ Pagani, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Giovio (VIAF: 35339438)
Bishop Giulio Giovio (born 1511, died 1563) Bishop Emeritus of Nocera de’ Pagani

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1553, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast