Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio Volpi

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1513Born
17 Apr 155945.2AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
16 Jul 155945.5Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
25 Mar 156046.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
Jul 1579³65.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
30 Aug 158874.6DiedBishop of Como, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Volpi (VIAF: 3643312)
Bishop Giovanni Antonio Volpi (born , died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComo, Diocese of Como
Ordained BishopSan Giacomo, Church, Como, Diocese of Como

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Dec 2012
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 292
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1559, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018