Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio Agustín

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1517Born
15 Dec 155740.8AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
18 Dec 155740.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 155740.8Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
8 Aug 156144.4AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
17 Dec 157659.8AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
31 May 158669.2DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Agustín (VIAF: 120697822)
Archbishop Antonio Agustín (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,353
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 104, and Page 309
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 212
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,386
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 68, Number 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast