Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Seripando, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1493Born
6 May 150714.0ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1516²22.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1539²45.6AppointedSuperior General of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1551²57.6ResignedSuperior General of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
30 Mar 155460.8AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
15 May 155461.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
26 Feb 156167.8Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 156167.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
17 Apr 156369.9DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Seripando (VIAF: 71410365)
Girolamo Cardinal Seripando O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroja, Diocese of Troia
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento
Buried Place (Original)S. Marco, Church, Trento, Diocese of Trento
Buried Place (Current)S. Giovanni in Carbonara, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 289
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018