Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ercole Cardinal Gonzaga

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1505Born
10 May 152115.4AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
3 May 152721.4Elevated to Cardinal
5 May 152721.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
29 Apr 152822.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Jul 152923.6AppointedAdministrator of Sovana (Soana), Italy
17 Apr 153226.4ResignedAdministrator of Sovana (Soana), Italy
26 Jun 153731.5AppointedAdministrator of Tarazona, Spain
3 Dec 154641.0ResignedAdministrator of Tarazona, Spain
1556²50.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 155650.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
8 Jun 156155.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
3 Mar 156357.2DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ercole Gonzaga (VIAF: 858762)
Ercole Cardinal Gonzaga (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova, Diocese of Mantova
Ordained BishopS. Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Diocese of Trento
Death PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento
Buried Place (Original)Ancestors' tomb, S. Pietro chapel, Cathedral, Mantova, Diocese of Mantova

  • a priest for 7.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
  • a cardinal for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 3 May 1527
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 70, Number 411
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 234
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 6
  • od/c0: CB, 12 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018