Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Gonzaga

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Mantova, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1540³Born
6 Jan 156322.5Elevated to Cardinal
27 Mar 156322.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
4 Jun 156322.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mantova, Italy
16 Oct 156424.2AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
21 Feb 1565³24.6DiedBishop-Elect of Mantova, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Federico Gonzaga
Federico Cardinal Gonzaga (born Jul 1540, died ) Bishop-Elect of Mantova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantua, Diocese of Mantova
Death PlaceMantua, Diocese of Mantova
Buried Place (Original)Saints Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Mantua, Diocese of Mantova

  • a cardinal for 2.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jan 1563
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018