Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Sanfelice

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1494²Born
14 Mar 152026.2AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
1550¹56.0ResignedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
4 May 158490.3AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
6 Mar 158591.1DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Sanfelice
Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Sanfelice (born 1494, died ) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsernia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 161, and Page 330
  • bp/bd: AT, 2 May 2016
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1520, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast