Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Simoncelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Bishop of Orvieto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹BornOrvieto, Italy
22 Dec 155331.9Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 155432.4AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
5 Dec 155432.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
17 Apr 156240.2ResignedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
1570²48.0AppointedAdministrator of Orvieto, Italy
Aug 1573²51.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Nov 157351.8Ordained BishopBishop of Orvieto, Italy
15 Jan 158866.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
30 Mar 159876.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
21 Feb 160078.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
24 Apr 160078.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
16 Jun 160381.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
24 Feb 160583.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Simoncelli
Girolamo Cardinal Simoncelli (born 1522, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
  • a cardinal for 51.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1553
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 323
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: AT, 2 May 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,872

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Jul 2016