Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Antonio Di Capua

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1513¹Born
22 Mar 153623.2AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
15 Oct 156552.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
6 May 156653.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
1579²66.0DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Di Capua (VIAF: 45370738)
Archbishop Pietro Antonio Di Capua (born 1513, died 1579) Archbishop of Otranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 212
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 259
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1536, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018