Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo de Cupis

Deceased

Bishop of Recanati


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jan 1546AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
22 Aug 1546Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
25 Feb 1548AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
1553¹DiedBishop of Recanati, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo de Cupis:
Bishop Paolo de Cupis (died 1553) Bishop of Recanati

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 281, and Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015