Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Cristoforo Spiriti

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Bishop of Cesena


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Apr 1510AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
28 Feb 1550AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
5 Nov 1556DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Cristoforo Spiriti
Patriarch Cristoforo Spiriti (died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 210, and Page 144
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,510, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast