Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianantonio Cardinal Capizucchi

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1515Born
20 Dec 155540.1Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jan 155640.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
5 Jul 155741.6AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
21 Dec 155742.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
6 Jul 156246.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
7 Nov 156550.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
1 Dec 156853.1AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
28 Jan 1569³53.2DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gianantonio Capizucchi
Gianantonio Cardinal Capizucchi (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)San Clemente, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
  • a cardinal for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1555
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1557, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast