Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio de Gasparis

Deceased

Bishop of Marsi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609¹BornVeroli
Jan 1650³41.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Feb 165041.1AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
20 Feb 165041.1Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
16 Aug 166455.6DiedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio de Gasparis
Bishop Ascanio de Gasparis (born 1609, died ) Bishop of Marsi

  • a priest for 14.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 5
  • ob: AT, 17 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016