Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio (Gregorio) Bolognetti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1595³BornRoma
23 Sep 163034.7AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy
7 Oct 163034.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy
26 Mar 163438.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
1639²43.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
28 Feb 163943.1AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
1660¹64.0ResignedBishop of Rieti, Italy
17 Jan 168084.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Rieti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio (Gregorio) Bolognetti:
Bishop Giorgio (Gregorio) Bolognetti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rieti

  • a bishop for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 293, and Page 96
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015