Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Scipione Cardinal Pannocchieschi d’Elci

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Pisa

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1598BornSiena
1 May 162930.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 May 162930.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 163133.0AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
17 Aug 163133.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pienza, Italy
3 Mar 163637.6AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
6 Dec 164648.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
24 Aug 165254.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
3 Oct 165254.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
9 Apr 165758.7Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
Mar 165859.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
29 Apr 165859.8Elevated to Cardinal
6 May 165859.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
27 Aug 166365.1ResignedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
12 Apr 167071.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Scipione Pannocchieschi d’Elci (VIAF: 89105540)
Scipione Cardinal Pannocchieschi d’Elci (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pisa

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
  • a cardinal for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Apr 1657
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 280
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 26
  • ob/c2+: AT, 3 Sep 2016
  • c1: CB, 3 Sep 2016
  • bd: AT, 18 Sep 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,993
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 278
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016