Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro Corsi

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1595Born
23 Mar 161924.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 166267.3AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
30 Dec 168085.8DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mauro Corsi
Bishop Mauro Corsi (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

EventPlace
Birth PlacePecciolo

  • a priest for 61.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 244
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,662, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast