Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrosio Fracassini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1597Born
12 Mar 166365.2AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
27 Mar 166365.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
22 Sep 166365.7DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Ambrosio Fracassini
Bishop Ambrosio Fracassini O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Pula (Pola)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 283
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,663, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast